Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3477782

EP3477782 - DIRECT COUPLING CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
08.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
08.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tyco Electronics AMP Korea Co., Ltd.
68, Gongdan 1-ro
Jinryang-eup
Gyeongsan-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 38459 / KR
[2019/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Lim, Kun Taek
c/o Tyco Electronics AMP Korea Co., Ltd., 68
Gongdan 1-ro, Jinryang-eub, Gyeongsan-si
38459 Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR
02 / Lee, Sang Moon
c/o Tyco Electronics AMP Korea Co., Ltd., 68
Gongdan 1-ro, Jinryang-eub, Gyeongsan-si
38459 Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR
 [2019/18]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2019/18]
Application number, filing date18201727.722.10.2018
[2019/18]
Priority number, dateKR2017013903925.10.2017         Original published format: KR 20170139039
KR2018010724207.09.2018         Original published format: KR 20180107242
[2019/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3477782
Date:01.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/71, H01R13/52, H01R13/621, // H01R13/10, H01R13/74, H01R107/00, H01R24/76
[2019/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/50]
Former [2019/18]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIREKTKUPPLUNGSVERBINDERANORDNUNG[2019/18]
English:DIRECT COUPLING CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY[2019/18]
French:ENSEMBLE DE CONNECTEUR DE COUPLAGE DIRECT[2019/18]
Examination procedure01.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.11.2019Examination requested  [2019/50]
01.11.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3159444  (STINE JR HOWARD E) [Y] 1-22 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2011053404  (TSURUTA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7,14-22 * figures 2,5,6 *;
 [Y]US4684190  (CLARK ROGER A [US], et al) [Y] 8-22 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5266047  (BLACK TERESA K [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2,4 * * sentences 62-68, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]US5743756  (HASZ RICHARD ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2011182694  (NISHIKAWA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *