EP3508220 - PEGYLATED LIPOSOMES FOR DELIVERY OF IMMUNOGEN-ENCODING RNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut, 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEALL, Andrew Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc IP Services M/s X-100b 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608-2916 / US | 02 /
VERMA, Ayush Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc IP Services M/s X-100b 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608-2916 / US | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Lucy Rose GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | Sanderson, Andrew John, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents, CN9.25.1 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18201799.6 | 31.08.2012 | [2019/28] | Priority number, date | US201161529878P | 31.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161529878 P | [2019/28] | Previously filed application, date | WO2012US53391 | 31.08.2012 | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508220 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39, A61K9/127, A61K9/00 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,RU,US);
A61K9/127 (RU,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,RU,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,RU,US);
A61K9/1271 (EP,RU,US);
A61P31/14 (EP,US);
C12N15/88 (EP,RU,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,RU,US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,RU,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,RU,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,RU,US);
A61K39/155 (EP,RU,US);
A61K39/245 (EP,RU,US);
C12N2710/16134 (EP,RU,US);
C12N2760/18534 (EP,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | PEGYLIERTE LIPOSOME ZUR FREISETZUNG VON IMMUNOGEN-CODIERENDER RNA | [2019/28] | English: | PEGYLATED LIPOSOMES FOR DELIVERY OF IMMUNOGEN-ENCODING RNA | [2019/28] | French: | LIPOSOMES PÉGYLÉS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION D'ARN CODANT UN IMMUNOGÈNE | [2019/28] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 08.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12769787.8 / EP2750707 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 24.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1083232 (JUNG GUENTHER PROF DR [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2010088537 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 1 * * page 7; claims 28-30 * * page 11, paragraph l * * page 88, paragraph l - page 89, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]WO2011008974 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-12 * pages 55-56; example 7 *; | [XP]WO2012006376 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 20, lines 13-14; example 1 *; | [XP]WO2012030901 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 1-12 * page 31, paragraph l * * page 33, paragraph 3 ** page 40, line 10 *; | [X] - MARYAM AMIDI ET AL, "Antigen-expressing immunostimulatory liposomes as a genetically programmable synthetic vaccine", SYSTEMS AND SYNTHETIC BIOLOGY, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, DORDRECHT, (20101026), vol. 5, no. 1 - 2, doi:10.1007/S11693-010-9066-Z, ISSN 1872-5333, pages 21 - 31, XP019943076 [X] 1,5,10-12 * pages 22-23 * * page 23, column l, paragraph l - page 23, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11693-010-9066-z | [X] - HIROSHI KITA ET AL, "Replication of Genetic Information with Self-Encoded Replicase in Liposomes", CHEMBIOCHEM, (20081013), vol. 9, no. 15, doi:10.1002/cbic.200800360, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 2403 - 2410, XP055007329 [X] 1,5-7 * page 2406, column r, paragraph l * * page 2409, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 2409, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200800360 | [Y] - KLIBANOV A L ET AL, "Amphipathic polyethyleneglycols effectively prolong the circulation time of liposomes", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 268, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0014-5793(90)81016-H, ISSN 0014-5793, (19900730), pages 235 - 237, (19900730), XP025890437 [Y] 1-12 * page 236, column l, paragraph l - page 236, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(90)81016-H | [Y] - ABDERRAHIM AISSAOUI ET AL, "Efficient topical delivery of plasmid DNA to lung in vivo mediated by putative triggered, PEGylated pDNA nanoparticles", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 154, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2011.06.017, ISSN 0168-3659, (20110604), pages 275 - 284, (20110615), XP028285878 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2011.06.017 | [XP] - MARYAM AMIDI ET AL, "Induction of humoral and cellular immune responses by antigen-expressing immunostimulatory liposomes", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (20120801), doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.08.016, ISSN 0168-3659, XP055044026 [XP] 1,5,10-12 * page 3, column l * * page 20, lines 13-14 * * example 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.08.016 | by applicant | WO0202606 | WO0234771 | WO03018054 | WO2005002619 | WO2005032582 | WO2005111066 | WO2005113782 | WO2005121348 | WO2006089264 | WO2006091517 | WO2006110413 | WO2006138004 | WO2007049155 | WO2008020330 | WO2009016515 | WO2009031043 | WO2009104092 | WO2009109860 | WO2010119343 | WO2011005799 | WO2011057020 | WO2011076807 | - D. HELLWINKEL, Systemic Nomenclature of Organic Chemistry, Springer, (20010000), page 203 | - JOHANNING et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (19950000), vol. 23, pages 1495 - 1501 | - HEYES et al., J Controlled Release, (20050000), vol. 107, pages 276 - 87 | - Liposome Technology, Informa Healthcare, (20060000), vol. I, II, I | - Functional Polymer Colloids and Microparticles volume 4 (Microspheres, microcapsules & liposomes), Citus Books, (20020000), vol. 4 | - JEFFS et al., Pharmaceutical Research, (20050000), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 362 - 372 | - EL OUAHABI et al., FEBS Letts, (19960000), vol. 380, pages 108 - 12 | - GIULIANI et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20060000), vol. 103, no. 29, pages 10834 - 9 | - GENNARO, Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, (20000000), ISBN 0683306472 | - ROMBERG et al., Pharmaceutical Research, (20080000), vol. 25, pages 55 - 71 | - HOEKSTRA et al., Biochimica et Biophysica Acta, (20040000), vol. 1660, pages 41 - 52 | - Methods In Enzymology, Academic Press, Inc. | - Handbook of Experimental Immunology, Blackwell Scientific Publications, (19860000), vol. I, IV | - YONEYAMA; FUJITA, Cytokine & Growth Factor Reviews, (20070000), vol. 18, pages 545 - 51 | - MAURER et al., Biophysical Journal, (20010000), vol. 80, pages 2310 - 2326 | - PERRI et al., J Virol, (20030000), vol. 77, pages 10394 - 10403 |