Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473853

EP3473853 - CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING MULTIPLE WIND ENERGY PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
25.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
25.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Geisler, Jens
Waldstraße 28a
24768 Rendsburg / DE
02 / Schmuck, Jesse Ben Benjamin
Kanzleistrasse 108
24943 Flensburg / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18201876.222.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE2017100983823.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017009838
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473853
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F03D7/04, F03D7/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN MEHRERER WINDENERGIEANLAGEN[2019/17]
English:CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING MULTIPLE WIND ENERGY PLANTS[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE PLURALITÉ D'ÉOLIENNES[2019/17]
Examination procedure22.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
22.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1790851  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,2,6,8 *;
 [Y]EP2636895  (GAMESA INNOVATION & TECH SL [ES]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]US2013300115  (SEEM JOHN E [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0098]; figure 13 *;
 [Y]CN106779201  (ELECTRIC POWER SCIENCE RES INST OF GUIZHOU POWER GRID CO LTD) [Y] 8,9 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2016146190  (RAVINDRA VISHAL CHOLAPADI [IN], et al) [Y] 5,10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 31] *