Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470902

EP3470902 - OPTICAL FIBER ASSEMBLIES HAVING A POWDER OR POWDER BLEND AT LEAST PARTIALLY MECHANICALLY ATTACHED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
25.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Cable Systems LLC
Intellectual Property Department SP-TI-3-1
Corning, NY 14831 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Bringuier, Anne G.
55 Lake Point Circle
Taylorsville, NC 28681 / US
02 / Burns, Rodney
1108 3rd Avenue Drive NW
Conover, NC 28613 / US
03 / Rowe, John A.
2039 Storm Canyon Road
Winston-Salem, NC 27106 / US
04 / Tedder, Catharina L.
4939 Pleasant View Lane
Catawba, NC 28609 / US
05 / Witz, Brian S.
4705 Bridle Path Lane
Greensboro, NC 27410 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18202102.213.07.2009
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20082211180831.07.2008         Original published format: US 22111808
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470902
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:OPTISCHE FASERANORDNUNGEN MIT ZUMINDEST TEILWEISE MECHANISCH FIXIERTEM PULVER ODER PULVERMISCHUNG[2019/16]
English:OPTICAL FIBER ASSEMBLIES HAVING A POWDER OR POWDER BLEND AT LEAST PARTIALLY MECHANICALLY ATTACHED[2019/16]
French:ENSEMBLES DE FIBRES OPTIQUES AYANT UNE POUDRE OU UN MÉLANGE PULVÉRULENT FIXÉ(E) AU MOINS PARTIELLEMENT MÉCANIQUEMENT[2019/16]
Examination procedure17.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
17.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09788909.1  / EP2310890
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
09.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1890175  (NEXANS [FR]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 4,5;
 [Y]US2002159726  (BROWN TONY [GB] ET AL) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0080] *;
 [A]DE4219607  (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 57; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]EP0564993  (NORDSON CORP [US]) [Y] 5 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 4 *;
 [XP]WO2009002448  (CORNING CABLE SYS LLC [US]; BRINGUIER ANNE G [US]; MCALPINE WARREN W [) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4909592
 US5388175