Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468098

EP3468098 - METHODS AND NODE TO SETUP PROTOCOL INDEPENDENT MULTICAST TREES IN THE PRESENCE OF UNIDIRECTIONAL TUNNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KOTALWAR, Jayant
701 East Middlefield Road
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / KOLLIPARA, Siva
701 East Middlefield Road
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18202118.820.01.2014
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS20131374795623.01.2013         Original published format: US201313747956
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468098
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/18, H04L12/715, H04L12/761, H04L12/707, H04L12/753, H04L12/723
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND KNOTEN ZUM EINRICHTEN PROTOKOLLUNABHÄNGIGER MEHRFACHADRESSENBÄUME IN GEGENWART VON UNIDIREKTIONALEN TUNNELN[2019/15]
English:METHODS AND NODE TO SETUP PROTOCOL INDEPENDENT MULTICAST TREES IN THE PRESENCE OF UNIDIRECTIONAL TUNNELS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET NOEUD PERMETTANT DE CONFIGURER DES ARBRES DE MULTIDIFFUSION INDÉPENDANTS DU PROTOCOLE EN PRÉSENCE DE TUNNELS UNIDIRECTIONNELS[2019/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14704430.9  / EP2949075
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
03.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012224477  (BALASUBRAMANIAN CHANDRAMOULI [US] ET AL) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0033]; figure 5 *;
 [A]US2010054245  (ASATI RAJIV [US] ET AL) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0026] - [0034] *;
 [A]US2010135294  (ASATI RAJIV [US] ET AL) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0004] , [0022]; claims 1,7,8 *
 [IDA]  - IJ WIJNANDS A BOERS E ROSEN CISCO SYSTEMS ET AL, "The Reverse Path Forwarding (RPF) Vector TLV; rfc5496.txt", THE REVERSE PATH FORWARDING (RPF) VECTOR TLV; RFC5496.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20090301), XP015065534 [ID] 1,3 * paragraphs [003.] - [3.3.2] * [A] 2,4