EP3643847 - FASTENING SYSTEM AND RAIL FOR A FASTENING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leviat GmbH Liebigstraße 14 40764 Langenfeld / DE | For all designated states Mannstaedt GmbH Mendener Straße 51 53840 Troisdorf / DE | For all designated states Fuchs Schraubenwerk GmbH Bismarckstrasse 24 57076 Siegen / DE | [2022/08] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states HALFEN GmbH Liebigstrasse 14 40764 Langenfeld / DE | ||
For all designated states Mannstaedt GmbH Mendener Straße 51 53840 Troisdorf / DE | |||
For all designated states Fuchs Schraubenwerk GmbH Bismarckstrasse 24 57076 Siegen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUSCHKAT, Bastian Elsterweg 15 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
HÄUSLER, Frank Friedrichstr. 102 40217 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
PHILIPP, Franz-Dieter Fröbelweg 15 53773 Hennef / DE | 04 /
DÜNKEL, Volker Am Ellenberg 20 57074 Siegen / DE | 05 /
FUCHS, Tillmann Im Neuenhof 21 57072 Siegen / DE | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Annette Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18202230.1 | 24.10.2018 | [2020/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643847 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3643847 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/41, F16B37/04 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
E04B1/4107 (EP);
F16B37/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] |
Former [2020/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM UND SCHIENE FÜR EIN BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/18] | English: | FASTENING SYSTEM AND RAIL FOR A FASTENING SYSTEM | [2020/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION ET RAIL POUR UN SYSTÈME DE FIXATION | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 22.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1667533 (H. G. CARLSON) [X] 15 * page 1, line 59 - page 2, line 37 * * figure - *; | [XAY]US1936223 (AWBREY SAMUEL C) [X] 15 * page 1, line 58 - page 2, paragraph 62 * * figure - * [A] 11-13 [Y] 1-10,14; | [A]CA1181921 (NIGHTINGALE INTERLOC LIMITED) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 1 - page 13, line 9 ** figure - *; | [Y]US2016265213 (ZHANG ZHIHUI [US], et al) [Y] 1-10,14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0039] * * figure - *; | [A]CN108086484 (LUOYANG GUYUE RAILWAY TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figure - * | Examination | CN201778398U | by applicant | US2010101175 |