Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470340

EP3470340 - COUPLING/UNCOUPLING MECHANISM AND COSMONAUTIC VEHICLE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Change - date of supplementary search reportpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi
Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HORIE, Youichi
KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Kawasaki-cho, Kakamigahara-shi
Gifu, 504-8710 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys
Patentanwälte
Viktualienmarkt 8
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7, II. Aufgang
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date18202245.916.12.2011
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2010028911027.12.2010         Original published format: JP 2010289110
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3470340
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3470340
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B64G1/64, F16B1/02, F16B21/06
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:KUPPLUNGS-/ENTKUPPLUNGSMECHANISMUS UND RAUMFAHRZEUG MIT DEMSELBEN[2019/16]
English:COUPLING/UNCOUPLING MECHANISM AND COSMONAUTIC VEHICLE COMPRISING THE SAME[2019/16]
French:MÉCANISME D'ACCOUPPLEMENT/DÉSACCOUPLEMENT ET VÉHICULE SPATIAL LE COMPRENANT[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
24.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11853500.4  / EP2660156
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0488872  (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * column 6, line 20 - line 28 * * column 6, line 47 - line 58 * * column 8, line 2 - line 18; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]JPS59167400  (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US6315247  (WEHNER MICHAEL J [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 33; figure 8a *;
 [A]US6499700  (SCHLOSSER CHRISTIAN [DE] ET AL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 9; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5372071  (RICHARDS LES H [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 7 - line 13 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 10 * * column 10, line 42 - line 57; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5205427  (CRAGO STEVEN C [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 4 *
by applicantJP3922718B
 JP2006290065
 WO0102248