Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471402

EP3471402 - INTEGRATED DEVICE FOR TEMPORAL BINNING OF RECEIVED PHOTONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Quantum-si Incorporated
530 Old Whitfield Street
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ROTHBERG, Jonathan, M.
215 Uncas Point Road
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
02 / FIFE, Keith, G.
635 Matadero Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
03 / BOISVERT, David
18900 Graystone Lane
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18202357.207.08.2015
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201462035377P08.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462035377 P
US201562164506P20.05.2015         Original published format: US 201562164506 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471402
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/374, H04N5/335
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTE VORRICHTUNG ZUR TEMPORÄREN GRUPPIERUNG VON EMPFANGENEN PHOTONEN[2019/16]
English:INTEGRATED DEVICE FOR TEMPORAL BINNING OF RECEIVED PHOTONS[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF INTÉGRÉ POUR LE GROUPEMENT TEMPOREL DE PHOTONS REÇUS[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15759983.8  / EP3194935
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2011103507  (PACIFIC BIOSCIENCES CALIFORNIA [US]; FEHR ADRIAN [US]; MCCAFFREY NATHA) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0188] - paragraph [0208] *;
 [A]WO2010025331  (MESA IMAGING AG [CH]; HOUSTON J GRANT [US]; LEHMANN MICHAEL [CH]; BUET) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0066] *