blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3471402


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
27.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.10.2018 Change - representative