Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470525

EP3470525 - PRODUCTION OF ANILINE VIA ANTHRANILATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covestro Deutschland AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / JÄGER, Gernot
Neusser Str. 413
50733 Köln / DE
02 / MAGNUS, Jorgen
Lotharstrasse 95
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / MOUSSA, Amgad, Salah
Gewerbegasse 6
79713 Bad Säckingen / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Levpat
c/o Covestro AG
Gebäude 4825
51365 Leverkusen / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18203096.519.02.2015
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateEP2014015593720.02.2014         Original published format: EP 14155937
EP2014019643105.12.2014         Original published format: EP 14196431
[2019/16]
Previously filed application, dateWO2015EP5352419.02.2015
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470525
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:C12P13/00, C12P7/40
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG VON ANILIN ÜBER ANTHRANILAT[2019/16]
English:PRODUCTION OF ANILINE VIA ANTHRANILATE[2019/16]
French:PRODUCTION D'ANILINE VIA L'ANTHRANILATE[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15705035.2  / EP3108001
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2660313  (RES INST INNOVATIVE TECH EARTH [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * See [0008], [0020-0029], [0034-0036], [0056], [0068-0069], [0086], as well as [0175/Table 1] *;
 [AD]WO2013103894  (PAROMATICS LLC [US], et al) [AD] 1-18 * See [0002], [0066] and Claims 73-77 and 83-86 *;
 [A]  - BALDERAS-HERNÁNDEZ ET AL, "Metabolic engineering for improving anthranilate synthesis from glucose in Escherichia coli", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, (2009), vol. 8, pages 1 - 12, XP021049888 [A] 1-18 * See page 1 (Abstract/E. coli W3110 trpD9923) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-8-19
 [A]  - LINDQUIST ET AL, "Degradation of benzoic acid and its derivatives in subcritical water", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (2011), vol. 1218, pages 2146 - 2152, XP028156540 [A] 1-18 * See Figures 7-8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2010.08.054
 [A]  - WANG ET AL, "Insights on the mechanism for synthesis of methylenedianiline from aniline and formaldehyde through HPLC-MS and isotope tracer studies", CHINESE CHEMICAL LETTERS, (2012), vol. 23, pages 1254 - 1258, XP002726351 [A] 17,18 * See page 1254 (first part of the introduction) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cclet.2012.10.001
 [A]  - DAVIS ET AL, "Nonenzymic decarboxylation of the aminobenzoates", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1964), vol. 14, pages 482 - 485, XP024831132 [A] 1-18 * See pages 482-485 (the ortho isomer) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(64)90091-9
 [A]  - STEVENS ET AL, "The decarboxylation of anthranilic acid", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (1952), vol. 30, pages 529 - 540, XP002741137 [A] 1-18 * See page 529 (Abstract) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/v52-065
 [A]  - BRZYSKA ET AL, "Thermal decomposition of Scandium(III) o-nitrobenzoate, o-chlorobenzoate, o-methylbenzoate, o-hydroxybenzoate, and o-aminobenzoate in air atmosphere", JOURNAL OF THERMAL ANALYSIS, (1988), vol. 34, pages 595 - 602, XP002788436 [A] 1-18 * See o-aminobenzoate *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02331760
 [AP]  - BALDERAS-HERNÁNDEZ ET AL, "Catechol biosynthesis from glucose in Escherichia coli anthranilate-overproducer strains by heterologous expression of anthranilate 1,2-dioxygenase from Pseudomonas aeruginosa PAO1", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, (20141004), vol. 13, pages 1 - 11, XP021200311 [AP] 1-18 * See page 1 (Abstract) and page 3 (Figure 1); early online publication *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12934-014-0136-x