Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3466965


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
18.10.2019 Request for examination filed published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
18.10.2019 Change - designated states published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
12.10.2019 Amendment by applicant
05.04.2019 Change - priority published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
30.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
05.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.10.2018 Change - representative