blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3466965 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201580024226 EP15712231 EP15712232 EP15712233 EP15719023 EP18203220



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2015138478Global Dossier 17.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201461953049 14.03.2014
US201461950529 10.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2015138475Global Dossier 17.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
US201461953146 14.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2015138473Global Dossier 17.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
US201461953221 14.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017173221Global Dossier 22.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19740 10.03.2015
US201461953146 14.03.2014
US201515124639 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017173105Global Dossier 22.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
US201515124638 10.03.2015
US201461953221 14.03.2014
WO2015US19738 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016362451Global Dossier 15.12.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
US201515121251 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10245299Global Dossier 02.04.2019B2
US2017072008 16.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201461953049 14.03.2014
US201515124636 10.03.2015
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19743 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20160127827Global Dossier 04.11.2016A
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2017513927Global Dossier 01.06.2017A
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
US201461953221 14.03.2014
WO2015US19738 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2017510568Global Dossier 13.04.2017A
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6554121BGlobal Dossier 31.07.2019B2
JP2017510400 13.04.2017A
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19740 10.03.2015
US201461953146 14.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6545727BGlobal Dossier 17.07.2019B2
JP2017513928 01.06.2017A
Priority number Date
US201461953049 14.03.2014
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19743 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3116896Global Dossier 19.12.2018B1
EP3116896 18.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3116524Global Dossier 28.11.2018B1
EP3116524 18.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201461953049 14.03.2014
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19743 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3116523Global Dossier 17.10.2018B1
EP3116523 18.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19740 10.03.2015
US201461953146 14.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3116522Global Dossier 08.05.2019B1
EP3116522 18.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
US201461953221 14.03.2014
WO2015US19738 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106459154Global Dossier 22.02.2017A
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3466965Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
EP15719023 10.03.2015
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
EP18203220 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2015229549B 23.05.2019B2
AU2015229549 18.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2019219809 12.09.2019A1
Priority number Date
AU2019219809 22.08.2019
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
AU2015229549 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2939696 17.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK3116896T 18.03.2019T3
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2706492T 29.03.2019T3
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19740 10.03.2015
US201461953146 14.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2711728T 07.05.2019T3
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2712608T 14.05.2019T3
Priority number Date
US201461953049 14.03.2014
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19743 10.03.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2016139369 10.04.2018A
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
WO2015US19796 10.03.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015138514Global Dossier 17.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201461950529 10.03.2014
TypeType Earlier application
 EP3116896