Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466965

EP3466965 - SELF-ASSEMBLING PEPTIDE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3-D Matrix Ltd.
Kojimachi-HF Bldg. 7F
3-2-4 Kojimachi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-0083 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GIL, Eun Seok
432 Great Elm Way
Acton, MA 01718 / US
02 / GILBERT, Karl
11 Riverside Ave
Apt. 111
Danvers, MA 01923 / US
03 / MEHTA, Manav
15 Waverly Street
Suite 210
Brighton, MA 02135 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)EIP
EIP Europe LLP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18203220.110.03.2015
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS201461950529P10.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461950529 P
[2019/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466965
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/08, A61L27/22, A61K38/12, A61L27/54, A61L27/58
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SELBSTANORDNENDE PEPTIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2019/15]
English:SELF-ASSEMBLING PEPTIDE COMPOSITIONS[2019/15]
French:COMPOSITIONS PEPTIDIQUES À AUTO-ASSEMBLAGE[2019/15]
Examination procedure10.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15719023.2  / EP3116896
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2013133413  (3 D MATRIX LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0034] *;
 [X]EP2345433  (3 D MATRIX LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0107] *;
 [A]WO2008039483  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP2823830  (3 D MATRIX LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - Y ZHAOYANG ET AL, "Temperature and ph effects on biophysical and morphological propertiesn of self-assembling peptide RADA-16-I", JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE SCIENCE., JOHN WILEY AND SONS LTD., (2008), vol. 14, ISSN 1075-2617, pages 152 - 162, XP008146649 [AD] 1-12 * page 155 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/psc.988
by applicantUS2009111734
 US2008032934
 US2014038909
 US7846891
 US7713923
 US5670483