Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470030

EP3470030 - HYBRID SEALING TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LOCKE, Christopher Brian
6 Bosworth Mews
Bournemouth, Dorset BH9 3SD / GB
02 / ROBINSON, Timothy Mark
27 Wellington Terrance
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG23 8HH / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Cordina, Kevin John
Simmons & Simmons LLP
CityPoint
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
Application number, filing date18203603.817.10.2014
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201361896582P28.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361896582 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470030
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00, A61F13/02, A61M1/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/45]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HYBRIDES DICHTUNGSBAND[2019/16]
English:HYBRID SEALING TAPE[2019/16]
French:RUBAN D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ HYBRIDE[2019/16]
Examination procedure26.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/45]
26.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14795899.5  / EP3062753
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2013090810  (KCI LICENSING INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0026] - [0047]; figure - *;
 [XA]US2010106106  (HEATON KEITH PATRICK [GB], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0028] - [0034]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-14;
 [XA]US2013152945  (LOCKE CHRISTOPHER BRIAN [GB], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0034] - [0056]; figure - * [A] 2-14