Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473206

EP3473206 - REMOVABLE ORTHODONTIC CORRECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
25.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
25.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hung, Cheng-Hsiang
126, Sec. 3, Pai-Hsin Road
Xien Dien District
New Taipei City / TW
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Westhafenplatz 1
60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18203770.509.03.2017
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateCN20161013293909.03.2016         Original published format: CN201610132939
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473206
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61C7/08, A61C7/10, A61C7/20
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ENTFERNBARE ORTHODONTISCHE KORREKTURVORRICHTUNG[2019/17]
English:REMOVABLE ORTHODONTIC CORRECTION DEVICE[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CORRECTION ORTHODONTIQUE AMOVIBLE[2019/17]
Examination procedure22.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
22.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP17160158.6  / EP3216418
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2007037110  (MAILYAN PAVEL D [AM]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0033] * * figure - *;
 [Y]US2012129117  (MCCANCE ANDREW [GB]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0082] * * figure 5 *;
 [A]CN103054652B  (AFFILIATED STOMATOLOGICAL HOSPITAL OF NANJING MEDICAL UNIVERSITY) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2007037110