Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3466692 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201611199467 EP16206084 EP18204142



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019248143Global Dossier 15.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201615379691 15.12.2016
US201916397280 29.04.2019
FR1563124 22.12.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3466692Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP16206084 22.12.2016
FR1563124 22.12.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FR3053923 05.07.2019B1
FR3053923 19.01.2018A1
Priority number Date
FR1756810 18.07.2017
FR1563124 22.12.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10336077Global Dossier 02.07.2019B2
US2017173960 22.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
FR1563124 22.12.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3225400Global Dossier 09.01.2019B1
EP3225400 04.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
FR1563124 22.12.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN107020816BGlobal Dossier 03.12.2019B
CN107020816 08.08.2017A
Priority number Date
FR1563124 22.12.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR3045459 23.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
FR1563124 22.12.2015
TypeType Earlier application
 EP3225400