Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466692

EP3466692 - PRINT HEAD OR INK JET PRINTER WITH REDUCED SOLVENT CONSUMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dover Europe Sàrl
Chemin de Blandonnet 8
1214 Vernier / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BARBET, Bruno
75B impasse du Lac
26800 ETOILE SUR RHONE / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18204142.622.12.2016
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateFR2015006312422.12.2015         Original published format: FR 1563124
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466692
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/105, B41J2/185, B41J2/09, B41J2/02, B41J2/03
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/42]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DRUCKKOPF ODER TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKER MIT VERRINGERTEM LÖSUNGSMITTELVERBRAUCH[2019/15]
English:PRINT HEAD OR INK JET PRINTER WITH REDUCED SOLVENT CONSUMPTION[2019/15]
French:TÊTE D'IMPRESSION OU IMPRIMANTE À JET D'ENCRE AYANT UNE CONSOMMATION RÉDUITE DE SOLVANT[2019/15]
Examination procedure10.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/42]
10.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16206084.2  / EP3225400
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2012038520  (MARKEM IMAJE [FR], et al) [X] 1,14 * column 14, line 15 - column 15, line 30; figures 2, 3 * [I] 2-13,15;
 [X]US2008284835  (PANCHAWAGH HRISHIKESH V [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * paragraph [0045]; figure 13 *;
 [X]US2007257971  (JEANMAIRE DAVID L [US]) [X] 1,14 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0057]; figure 2 *
by applicantUS8540350
 FR2952851
 US7192121
 FR2851495
 WO2012038520