Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473456

EP3473456 - SUSPENSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
McLaren Automotive Limited
McLaren Technology Centre
Chertsey Road
Woking
Surrey GU 21 4YH / GB
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / RANDLE, Steven James
38 Eton Road
Stratford Upon Avon, Warwickshire CV37 7ER / GB
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Slingsby Partners LLP
1 Kingsway
London WC2B 6AN / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18204183.017.03.2014
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateGB2013000481915.03.2013         Original published format: GB 201304819
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473456
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60G3/20, B60G3/26, B62D17/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:AUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEM[2019/17]
English:SUSPENSION SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE SUSPENSION[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
02.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14710883.1  / EP2969604
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]FR2872452  (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR]; MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7-9 [I] 10;
 [Y]EP1247663  (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR]; MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH]) [Y] 7-9 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3497233
 US6776426