Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3488808

EP3488808 - CONTROL UNIT FOR A MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2020New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Human Extensions Ltd
P.O. Box 8180
4 Meir Ariel Street
Grand Netter Building, 2nd floor
4250574 Netanya / IL
[2019/22]
Inventor(s)01 / SHOLEV, Mordehai
Human Extensions Ltd.
6 Kalanit Street, Moshav Amikam
3783000 Doar-Na Alona / IL
 [2019/22]
Representative(s)Carlos Hernando, Borja
Garrigues IP, S.L.P.
Hermosilla, 3
28001 Madrid / ES
[2019/22]
Application number, filing date18204228.301.09.2014
[2019/22]
Priority number, dateUS201361872727P01.09.2013         Original published format: US 201361872727 P
US201461972528P31.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461972528 P
[2019/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3488808
Date:29.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B34/00, A61B17/29, A61B17/00
[2019/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUEREINHEIT FÜR EINE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2019/22]
English:CONTROL UNIT FOR A MEDICAL DEVICE[2019/22]
French:UNITÉ DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL[2019/22]
Examination procedure08.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/22]
09.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.12.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14840752.1  / EP3038542
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
05.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP1584300  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-8,10-12 * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] - [0049] , [0098] - [0102]; figures 1-4,26 * [A] 9;
 [Y]US2011118748  (ITKOWITZ BRANDON [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0070] - [0073] - [0 75] , [0160]; figure 2b *;
 [YA]US2012130401  (BARRIER PASCAL [FR], et al) [Y] 9 * column 122; figure 26 * [A] 1-8,10-12;
 [A]US2013150833  (PEINE WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 11,12 * paragraphs [0013] , [0016] , [0039] , [0048] , [0054] , [0060] *;
 [A]US2005070885  (NOBIS RUDOLPH [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0043]; figure 5 *;
 [A]US2007208375  (NISHIZAWA KOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071]; figures 5,8 *;
 [A]US2008287862  (WEITZNER BARRY [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1,2a-c *
by applicantUS2008255420
 US2012041450
 US7572253
 US2498692
 US4753223
 US6126649
 US5873842
 US7481793
 US6817974
 US7682307
 US2009259141
 US4911148