Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013040070 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261616309 | 27.03.2012 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201261607901 | 07.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013040028 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2014 | A3 | WO2013040028 | 21.03.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161534709 | 14.09.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9942818 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2018 | B2 | US2017127328 | 04.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414344570 | 12.03.2014 | US201261616309 | 27.03.2012 | US201514872924 | 01.10.2015 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201715400594 | 06.01.2017 | US201261607901 | 07.03.2012 | WO2012US54912 | 12.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9949184 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2018 | B2 | US2017118684 | 27.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414344570 | 12.03.2014 | US201715400658 | 06.01.2017 | US201261616309 | 27.03.2012 | US201514872924 | 01.10.2015 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201261607901 | 07.03.2012 | WO2012US54912 | 12.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9578564 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2017 | B2 | US2016057670 | 25.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414344570 | 12.03.2014 | US201261616309 | 27.03.2012 | US201514872924 | 01.10.2015 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201261607901 | 07.03.2012 | WO2012US54912 | 12.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9226206 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2015 | B2 | US2014349659 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261616309 | 27.03.2012 | US201214344570 | 12.09.2012 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201261607901 | 07.03.2012 | WO2012US54912 | 12.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9544827 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2017 | B2 | US2014342738 | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201214344492 | 12.09.2012 | US201161534709 | 14.09.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | WO2012US54856 | 12.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014198655 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201214118826 | 31.05.2012 | WO2012US40288 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10833994 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | B2 | US2014153390 | 05.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201214118473 | 31.05.2012 | WO2012US40279 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10454829 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2019 | B2 | US2017272364 | 21.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US40288 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201715470262 | 27.03.2017 | US201414118826 | 28.02.2014 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140044355 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US40288 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101901267B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2018 | B1 | KR20140034274 | 19.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US40279 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6130836B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2017 | B2 | JP2014530538 | 17.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161534709 | 14.09.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | WO2012US54856 | 12.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014522602 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US40288 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014522601 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US40279 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2756726 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2015 | A4 | EP2756726 | 23.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261616309 | 27.03.2012 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201261607901 | 07.03.2012 | WO2012US54912 | 12.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2756623 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2018 | B1 | EP2756623 | 15.07.2015 | A4 | EP2756623 | 23.07.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161534709 | 14.09.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | WO2012US54856 | 12.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2716102 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2021 | B1 | EP2716102 | 27.05.2015 | A4 | EP2716102 | 09.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US40288 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2715981 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2018 | B1 | EP2715981 | 20.05.2015 | A4 | EP2715981 | 09.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US40279 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108684060 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201280038695 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108419273B | Global Dossier | 08.06.2021 | B | CN108419273 | 17.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | CN201280038270 | 31.05.2012 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103733682 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US40288 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103718514B | Global Dossier | 16.03.2018 | B | CN103718514 | 09.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US40279 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3457751 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2022 | B1 | EP3457751 | 20.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US40279 | 31.05.2012 | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | EP12794051 | 31.05.2012 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012166975 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012166969 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6400752B | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B2 | JP2017099019 | 01.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6306671B | Global Dossier | 04.04.2018 | B2 | JP2017034728 | 09.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161492321 | 01.06.2011 | US201161502023 | 28.06.2011 | US201161512132 | 27.07.2011 | US201161500426 | 23.06.2011 | US201161533382 | 12.09.2011 | US201161505955 | 08.07.2011 | US201161503975 | 01.07.2011 | Type | Earlier application | EP2715981 |