Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474574

EP3474574 - A METHOD OF EXCHANGING DATA PACKAGES BETWEEN FIRST AND SECOND PORTABLE COMMUNICATION DEVICES USING A FAVOURED FREQUENCY BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GN Hearing A/S
Lautrupbjerg 7
2750 Ballerup / DK
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PEDERSEN, Brian Dam
c/o GN Hearing A/S
Group IPR
Lautrupbjerg 7
2750 Ballerup / DK
02 / JENSEN, Klaus Hagen
c/o GN Hearing A/S
Group IPR
Lautrupbjerg 7
2750 Ballerup / DK
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18204720.918.08.2015
[2019/17]
Previously filed application, dateEP2015018138218.08.2015
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474574
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00, H04B17/309, H04B17/382
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AUSTAUSCH VON DATENPAKETEN ZWISCHEN EINEM ERSTEN UND EINEM ZWEITEN TRAGBAREN KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES FAVORISIERTEN FREQUENZBANDS[2019/17]
English:A METHOD OF EXCHANGING DATA PACKAGES BETWEEN FIRST AND SECOND PORTABLE COMMUNICATION DEVICES USING A FAVOURED FREQUENCY BAND[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCHANGE DE PAQUETS DE DONNÉES ENTRE DES PREMIERS ET SECONDS DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION PORTABLES AU MOYEN D'UNE BANDE DE FRÉQUENCE PRÉFÉRÉE[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15181382.1  / EP3133838
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010054512  (SOLUM JEFFREY PAUL [US]) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2008015655  (BANGE JOSEPH E [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005227624  (HIDDINK GERRIT W [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0 57] - [0058] *;
 [A]US2006133543  (LINSKY JOEL [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *