Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471083 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471083



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 118
29.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
08.11.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
08.11.2018 Drawings Search / examination 5
08.11.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 Description Search / examination 17
08.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
08.11.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
08.11.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
19.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
19.03.2019 European search report Search / examination 3
19.03.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 7
19.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.10.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
15.10.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
15.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.10.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.10.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2