blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471083 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471083



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 118
15.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.10.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.10.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.10.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
15.10.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
15.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.04.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
19.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.03.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 7
19.03.2019 European search report Search / examination 3
19.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
08.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
08.11.2018 Description Search / examination 17
08.11.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 Drawings Search / examination 5
08.11.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
29.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42