blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3471083 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280023695 CN201410080693 CN201510501490 CN201510557564 CN201610344219 CN201680033218 CN201810947086 EP12785333 EP14157112 EP18205133



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2016203430Global Dossier 22.12.2016A1
Priority number Date
CA2894717 19.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012156942Global Dossier 22.11.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201161487272 17.05.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019197952Global Dossier 27.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201414459979 14.08.2014
US201213474131 17.05.2012
US201715431974 14.02.2017
US201161487272 17.05.2011
US201916275904 14.02.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019180684Global Dossier 13.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
CA2894717 19.06.2015
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201615184233 16.06.2016
US201815903698 23.02.2018
US201916266557 04.02.2019
US201313789978 08.03.2013
US201715635653 28.06.2017
US201414491763 19.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018293941Global Dossier 11.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201715609249 31.05.2017
US201313789978 08.03.2013
US201615045382 17.02.2016
US201816005313 11.06.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018158411Global Dossier 07.06.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201715494951 24.04.2017
US201815888451 05.02.2018
US201615133318 20.04.2016
US201313789978 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018137821Global Dossier 17.05.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201414459979 14.08.2014
US201815867937 11.01.2018
US201213474131 17.05.2012
US201161487272 17.05.2011
US201313789978 08.03.2013
US201414491763 19.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014368491Global Dossier 18.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201313789978 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10249237Global Dossier 02.04.2019B2
US2017154574 01.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201414459979 14.08.2014
US201213474131 17.05.2012
US201715431974 14.02.2017
US201161487272 17.05.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10242619Global Dossier 26.03.2019B2
US2018182293 28.06.2018A1
Priority number Date
CA2894717 19.06.2015
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201615184233 16.06.2016
US201815903698 23.02.2018
US201313789978 08.03.2013
US201715635653 28.06.2017
US201414491763 19.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10013915Global Dossier 03.07.2018B2
US2017263182 14.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201715609249 31.05.2017
US201313789978 08.03.2013
US201615045382 17.02.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9934725Global Dossier 03.04.2018B2
US2017301292 19.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
CA2894717 19.06.2015
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201615184233 16.06.2016
US201313789978 08.03.2013
US201715635653 28.06.2017
US201414491763 19.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9922596Global Dossier 20.03.2018B2
US2017229065 10.08.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201715494951 24.04.2017
US201615133318 20.04.2016
US201313789978 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9886899Global Dossier 06.02.2018B2
US2015054811 26.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201414459979 14.08.2014
US201213474131 17.05.2012
US201161487272 17.05.2011
US201313789978 08.03.2013
US201414491763 19.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9721505Global Dossier 01.08.2017B2
US2016293104 06.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
CA2894717 19.06.2015
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201615184233 16.06.2016
US201313789978 08.03.2013
US201414491763 19.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9697771Global Dossier 04.07.2017B2
US2016163262 09.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201313789978 08.03.2013
US201615045382 17.02.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9659527Global Dossier 23.05.2017B2
US2016232845 11.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201615133318 20.04.2016
US201313789978 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9606607Global Dossier 28.03.2017B2
US2014354624 04.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414459979 14.08.2014
US201213474131 17.05.2012
US201161487272 17.05.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9134825Global Dossier 15.09.2015B2
US2012293481 22.11.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201213474131 17.05.2012
US201161487272 17.05.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2710578Global Dossier 24.04.2019B1
EP2710578 22.04.2015A4
EP2710578 26.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161487272 17.05.2011
WO2012IB52491 17.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109272933Global Dossier 25.01.2019A
Priority number Date
US201161487272 17.05.2011
CN201280023695 17.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107615085BGlobal Dossier 19.07.2019B
CN107615085 19.01.2018A
Priority number Date
CA2894717 19.06.2015
WO2016IB53592 16.06.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105869575BGlobal Dossier 21.09.2018B
CN105869575 17.08.2016A
Priority number Date
US201161487272 17.05.2011
CN201280023695 17.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105390094BGlobal Dossier 20.08.2019B
CN105390094 09.03.2016A
Priority number Date
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201414491763 19.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105374318Global Dossier 02.03.2016A
Priority number Date
US201414459979 14.08.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103688302BGlobal Dossier 29.06.2016B
CN103688302 26.03.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161487272 17.05.2011
WO2012IB52491 17.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2894717Global Dossier 19.12.2016A1
Priority number Date
CA2894717 19.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3471083Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP14157112 28.02.2014
US201313789978 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE102015215555 18.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201414459979 14.08.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE102015216798 03.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201414474977 02.09.2014
US201414491763 19.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE112016002765T 29.03.2018T5
Priority number Date
CA2894717 19.06.2015
WO2016IB53592 16.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9351368Global Dossier 24.05.2016B2
US2014252988 11.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313789978 08.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2782090Global Dossier 21.11.2018B1
EP2782090 24.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313789978 08.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104036719BGlobal Dossier 03.05.2017B
CN104036719 10.09.2014A
Priority number Date
US201313789978 08.03.2013
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2782090