Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471083

EP3471083 - PIXEL CIRCUITS FOR AMOLED DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
18.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
18.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ignis Innovation Inc.
50 Bathurst Drive, Unit 12
Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2C5 / CA
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / AZIZI, Yaser
558 Box Grove Place
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 4V3 / CA
02 / CHAJI, Gholamreza
463 Kelso Drive
Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2S3 / CA
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18205133.428.02.2014
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20131378997808.03.2013         Original published format: US201313789978
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471083
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/32
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/47]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:PIXELSCHALTUNGEN FÜR AMOLED-ANZEIGEN[2019/16]
English:PIXEL CIRCUITS FOR AMOLED DISPLAYS[2019/16]
French:CIRCUITS DE PIXELS POUR ÉCRANS AMOLED[2019/16]
Examination procedure15.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/47]
15.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14157112.5  / EP2782090
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2012299978  (CHAJI GHOLAMREZA [CA]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0085] , [0086] , [0099] , [0100]; figures 5A-6D *;
 [I]EP2133860  (SAMSUNG MOBILE DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0073] - [0082]; figures 3, 7A-7B,8A-8C *;
 [I]US2009295423  (LEVEY CHARLES I [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0042] - [0046]; figures 1-4 *;
 [I]US2011205250  (YOO MYOUNG-HWAN [KR] ET AL) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0131] - [0185]; figures 3-9 *;
 [I]EP2383720  (IGNIS INNOVATION INC [CA]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0106] - [0162]; figures 8,12,13,14 *;
 [I]US2010103159  (LEON FELIPE A [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0044] - [0049]; figures 3,5 *;
 [I]US2010103082  (LEVEY CHARLES I [US] ET AL) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0042] - [0052]; figures 2,4 *;
 [I]US2008315788  (LEVEY CHARLES I [US] ET AL) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0039] - [0047]; figures 2,4 *