blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3650582

EP3650582 - TEMPERATURE RESISTANT AMORPHOUS CARBON COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  25.09.2020
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2020Refusal of applicationpublished on 28.10.2020  [2020/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nanofilm Technologies International Pte Ltd
Block 28
Ayer Rajah Crescent 02-02/03/04
Ayer Rajah Industrial Estate
Singapore 139959 / SG
[2020/20]
Representative(s)Schlich, George
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
[2020/20]
Application number, filing date18205138.308.11.2018
[2020/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3650582
Date:13.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2019
ClassificationIPC:C23C28/00, C23C14/02, C23C14/06, C23C14/08, C23C16/02, C23C16/26, C23C16/40, C23C28/04
[2020/20]
CPC:
C23C28/00 (EP); C23C14/325 (EP,CN,US); C23C14/0605 (EP,CN,US);
C23C14/021 (US); C23C14/024 (EP,CN,US); C23C14/0635 (EP,CN,US);
C23C14/0641 (US); C23C14/0652 (EP,CN,US); C23C14/0682 (CN);
C23C14/08 (EP); C23C14/081 (CN); C23C14/10 (CN);
C23C14/35 (CN,US); C23C28/042 (EP); C23C28/046 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TEMPERATURBESTÄNDIGE AMORPHEKOHLENSTOFFBESCHICHTUNGEN[2020/20]
English:TEMPERATURE RESISTANT AMORPHOUS CARBON COATINGS[2020/20]
French:REVÊTEMENTS DE CARBONE AMORPHE RÉSISTANT À LA TEMPÉRATURE[2020/20]
Examination procedure12.06.2020Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2020/44]
23.06.2020Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/44]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2007020138  (BEKAERT SA NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9-11 * page 2, line 5 - line 30 * * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 17 * * page 5, line 20 - line 22 * * page 5, line 30 - page 7, line 2 * * page 7, line 10 - page 9, line 19 * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 15 * * claims 1-19 * [A] 12,13 [I] 4,6-8;
 [XAI]JP2010116295  (CANON KK) [X] 1-8,10 *passages refer to the automatic translated document* * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * * figure 1; claims 1,6,7,9-11,14 * [A] 12,13 [I] 9,11;
 [A]WO2017011315  (ENTEGRIS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0052] * * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]  - F. BERNHARDT ET AL, "Development of a ta-C diamond-like carbon (DLC) coating by magnetron sputtering for use in precision glass molding", MATERIALWISSENSCHAFT UND WERKSTOFFTECHNIK., DE, (20130801), vol. 44, no. 8, doi:10.1002/mawe.201300171, ISSN 0933-5137, pages 661 - 666, XP055584150 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 661, paragraph 1. - page 662, paragraph 3. * * page 665, paragraph 5. - paragraph 6. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mawe.201300171
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.