Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467108

EP3467108 - METHODS FOR PURIFICATION OF MESSENGER RNA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
11.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
11.10.2019Change - extension statespublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
11.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Translate Bio, Inc.
29 Hartwell Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HEARTLEIN, Michael
c/o Shire Human Genetic Therapies Inc.
300 Shire Way
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
02 / DEROSA, Frank
c/o Shire Human Genetic Therapies Inc.
300 Shire Way
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
03 / DIAS, Anusha
c/o Shire Human Genetic Therapies Inc.
300 Shire Way
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
04 / KARVE, Shrirang
c/o Shire Human Genetic Therapies Inc.
300 Shire Way
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18205176.314.03.2014
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS201361784996P14.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361784996 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467108
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/10
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA03.10.2019
ME03.10.2019
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON MESSENGER-RNA[2019/15]
English:METHODS FOR PURIFICATION OF MESSENGER RNA[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE PURIFICATION D'ARN MESSAGER[2019/15]
Examination procedure03.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
03.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14714150.1  / EP2970955
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012077080  (THOMPSON TRACY [NZ], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document, in particular [0043], [0066], Example 12 Table 3, [0196] *;
 [X]WO9805673  (MEGABIOS CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document, in particular p.7 last paragraph, p.8 last paragraph to p.9, first paragraph *;
 [Y]WO9830685  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2014107571  (EXOSOME DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document, in particular [00189] *
 [Y]  - SAUMYA BHADURI ET AL, "Procedure for the Preparation of Milligram Quantities of Adenovirus Messenger Ribonucleic Acid", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., US, (19721201), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1126 - 1129, XP055232582 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document, in particular p.1127, right-hand column, first paragraph *
 [Y]  - FERNANDEZ V M ET AL, "CROSS FLOW FILTRATION OF RNA EXTRACTS BY HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE", ACTA BIOTECHNOLOGICA, AKADEMIE VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19920101), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1002/ABIO.370120113, ISSN 0138-4988, pages 49 - 56, XP000675220 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/abio.370120113
 [Y]  - Promega, "Riboprobe in vitro Transcription Systems", (20010901), URL: https://bio.as.uky.edu/sites/default/files/Riboprobe manual.pdf, (20160719), XP055289815 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document, in particular p. 13 *
 [X]  - B P De ET AL, "Characterization of an in vitro system for the synthesis of mRNA from human parainfluenza virus type 3", Journal of Virology, United States, (19900301), pages 1135 - 1142, URL: https://jvi.asm.org/content/jvi/64/3/1135.full.pdf, XP055542011 [X] 14 * the whole document, in particular "Materials and Methods" *
by applicantUS4373071
 US4401796
 US4415732
 US4458066
 US4500707
 US4668777
 US4973679
 US5047524
 US5132418
 US5153319
 US5262530
 US5700642
 US5256294
 US5490937