Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467779

EP3467779 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DATA AND MODEL-DRIVEN IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION AND ENHANCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heartflow, Inc.
1700 Seaport Boulevard Suite 400
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GRADY, Leo, J.
1320 Lasuen Drive
Millbrae, CA 94030 / US
02 / SCHAAP, Michael
1354 Dale Ave. No.1
Mountain View, CA 94035 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18205784.425.03.2015
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS201461972056P28.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461972056 P
US20141429146530.05.2014         Original published format: US201414291465
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467779
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/00, G06T5/00, G06T5/50
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DATEN- UND MODELLBASIERTEN BILDREKONSTRUKTION UND -VERBESSERUNG[2019/15]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DATA AND MODEL-DRIVEN IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION AND ENHANCEMENT[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RECONSTRUCTION ET D'AMÉLIORATION D'IMAGES GUIDÉES PAR MODÈLE ET PAR DONNÉES[2019/15]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15717318.8  / EP3123447
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2011073864  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 10 * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 2 *
 [XI]  - BAKA N ET AL, "Statistical Shape Model-Based Femur Kinematics From Biplane Fluoroscopy", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (201208), vol. 31, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TMI.2012.2195783, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 1573 - 1583, XP011491129 [X] 1,4,8-10 * page 1574, column r - page 1577, column l * * figures 1,2,3 * [I] 2,3,5-7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2012.2195783