EP3480564 - POSITION MEASUREMENT ENCODER AND METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw PLC New Mills Wotton-under-Edge, Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIBBLE, Andrew Paul Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge, Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Rolfe, Edward William, et al Patent Department Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 18206036.8 | 04.06.2010 | [2019/19] | Priority number, date | GB20090009724 | 05.06.2009 Original published format: GB 0909724 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480564 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/244, G01D5/245, G01D5/347 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
G01D5/24461 (EP,KR,US);
G01D5/2455 (EP,KR,US);
G01D5/34715 (EP,KR,US);
G01D5/34792 (EP,US);
G01D5/34794 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] |
Former [2019/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | POSITIONSMESSUNGSCODIERER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB | [2019/19] | English: | POSITION MEASUREMENT ENCODER AND METHOD OF OPERATION | [2019/19] | French: | CODEUR DE MESURE DE POSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 08.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10731775.2 / EP2438402 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6556153 (CARDAMONE JOSEPH M [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 50 - column 15, line 37; figures 1-3, 10 *; | [XA]DE4436784 (ZEISS CARL [DE]) [X] 1,9-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0013] - [0 22] - [0037]; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-8,13; | [A]EP1635073 (BAMFORD EXCAVATORS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0038] ** paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0081]; figures 1,3,7; claims 1,12,13 * |