Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466396

EP3466396 - HUFF COUGH SIMULATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trudell Medical International
725 Third Street
London, Ontario N5V 5G4 / CA
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / COSTELLA, Stephen
52 Bloomfield Drive
London, Ontario N6G 1P3 / CA
02 / MEYER, Adam
1808 Milestone Road
London, Ontario N5X 2E9 / CA
03 / SCARROTT, Peter
445 Victoria Street
London, Ontario N5Y 4B2 / CA
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18206232.311.07.2014
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS201361845689P12.07.2013         Original published format: US 201361845689 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466396
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61H31/00, A61M16/00, A61M16/20
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SCHNAUFHUSTENSIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:HUFF COUGH SIMULATION DEVICE[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SIMULATION DE TOUX D'EXPIRATION[2019/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14822301.9  / EP3019137
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4210174  (EROSS BELA [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, lines 6-27 * * column 2, lines 42-48; figures 1, 2, 4 *;
 [A]US3486502  (WILSON ROBERT K) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 10; figures 2, 3 *;
 [A]WO0189618  (ATOS MEDICAL AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 8; figures 2, 3 *