Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473673

EP3473673 - FIBER COMPRISING ETHYLENE-BASED POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.11.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2020New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies, LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KARJALA, Teresa
56 Mandevilla Court
Lake Jackson, Texas 77566 / US
02 / CONG, Rongjuan
144 Indian Warrior
Lake Jackson, Texas 77566 / US
03 / TICE, Colleen
Unit G, 2022 W. Main Street
Houston, Texas 77098 / US
04 / HAYNE, Sarah
14122 Pinerock Lane
Houston, Texas 77079 / US
05 / DEMIRORS, Mehmet
2319 Bending Spring Drive
Pearland, Texas 77584 / US
06 / KARDOS, Lori
55 Snapdragon Ct.
Lake Jackson, Texas 77566 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date18206327.110.03.2011
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20108149021014.06.2010         Original published format: US 81490210
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473673
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/08, B32B27/32, C08J5/18, C08L23/04, D01F6/30
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:FASER, ENTHALTEND ETHYLEN-BASIERTE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2019/17]
English:FIBER COMPRISING ETHYLENE-BASED POLYMER COMPOSITIONS[2019/17]
French:FIBRE COMPRENANT DES COMPOSITIONS POLYMERES A BASE D'ETHYLENE[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.01.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11708669.4  / EP2580279
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2011159376  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2011109563  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP2607530  (TREVIRA GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantUS4340563
 US4663220
 US4668566
 US4322027
 US4413110
 US3485706
 US6545088
 US6538070
 US6566446
 US5844045
 US5869575
 US6448341
 WO2006081116
    - B. MONRABAL et al., Macromol. Symp., (20070000), vol. 257, pages 71 - 79
    - KARJALA, TERESA P.; SAMMLER, ROBERT L.; MANGNUS, MARC A.; HAZLITT, LONNIE G.; JOHNSON, MARK S.; HAGEN, CHARLES M., JR.; HUANG, JOE, "Detection of low levels of long-chain branching in polyolefins", Annual Technical Conference - Society of Plastics Engineers, (20080000), pages 887 - 891
    - Macromolecules, (20050000), vol. 38, page 6988
    - L. WILD; R.T. RYLE et al., J. Polymer Science Polymer Physics Edition, (19820000), vol. 20, pages 441 - 455
    - WILLIAMS; WARD, J. Polym. Sci., Polym. Let., (19680000), vol. 6, page 621
    - STRIEGEL; YAU et al., Modern Size-Exclusion Liquid Chromatography, Wiley, (20090000), page 86
    - Y. JIN; T. HERMEL-DAVIDOCK; T. KARJALA; M. DEMIRORS; J. WANG; E. LEYVA; D. ALLEN, "Shrink Force Measurement of Low Shrink Force Films", SPE ANTEC Proceedings, (20080000), page 1264