Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470600

EP3470600 - FLOOR PANEL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
04.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
04.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unilin, BVBA
Ooigemstraat 3
8710 Wielsbeke / BE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Vermeulen, Bruno Paul Louis
Grinaraweg 14
3680 Aldeneik-Maaseik / BE
02 / De Rick, Jan Eddy
Kampstraat 16B
9500 Geraardsbergen / BE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)De Vries & Metman
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18206371.915.04.2010
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470600
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/02, F16B5/00, E04F15/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/45]
Former [2019/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BODENPLATTENANORDNUNG[2019/16]
English:FLOOR PANEL ASSEMBLY[2019/16]
French:ENSEMBLE DE PANNEAU DE PLANCHER[2019/16]
Examination procedure25.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/45]
25.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10714264.8  / EP2558658
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
15.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2008004960  (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-11 * figures 6a-6d * [A] 3 [I] 6,7;
 [X]US2009193748  (BOO CHRISTIAN [SE], et al) [X] 11 * figure 2b *;
 [AD]US2009064624  (SOKOL OLIVER [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2009064624