EP3654507 - MONITORABLE ELECTRICAL COMPONENT WITH AT LEAST ONE FUNCTIONAL PURPOSE AS CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/21] | MONITORABLE ELECTRICAL COMPONENT WITH AT LEAST ONE FUNCTIONAL ALIGNMENT AS CAPACITOR | ||
[2021/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feil, Wolfgang Münchshöf 1 92421 Schwandorf / DE | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18206768.6 | 16.11.2018 | [2020/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654507 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3654507 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/32, H02M1/36, H02H9/00 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02H9/001 (EP);
H02M1/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2020/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHBARES ELEKTRISCHES BAUELEMENT MIT MINDESTENS EINER FUNKTIONALEN AUSRICHTUNG ALS KONDENSATOR | [2020/21] | English: | MONITORABLE ELECTRICAL COMPONENT WITH AT LEAST ONE FUNCTIONAL PURPOSE AS CAPACITOR | [2021/45] | French: | COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE POUVANT ÊTRE SURVEILLÉ DOTÉ D'AU MOINS UN BUT FONCTIONNEL EN TANT QUE CONDENSATEUR | [2021/45] |
Former [2020/21] | MONITORABLE ELECTRICAL COMPONENT WITH AT LEAST ONE FUNCTIONAL ALIGNMENT AS CAPACITOR | ||
Former [2020/21] | COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE POUVANT ÊTRE SURVEILLÉ DOTÉ D'AU MOINS UN ALIGNEMENT FONCTIONNEL EN TANT QUE CONDENSATEUR | Examination procedure | 19.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 19.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2018 | AL | 11.05.2022 | CY | 11.05.2022 | CZ | 11.05.2022 | DK | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | ES | 11.05.2022 | FI | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | NL | 11.05.2022 | PL | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SE | 11.05.2022 | SI | 11.05.2022 | SK | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | BG | 11.08.2022 | NO | 11.08.2022 | GR | 12.08.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | PT | 12.09.2022 | GB | 16.11.2022 | IE | 16.11.2022 | LU | 16.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.11.2018 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
GB | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
GB | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
GB | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
GB | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 11.05.2022 | |
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | ES | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN201069461Y (ZHONGCHUAN ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-10,12-19,21-28,30-38; | [XY]EP2400649 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY [JP]) [X] 1,11,20,29 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 23] , [0 26] , [0 33] , [0 36] , [0 42] , [0 46] , [0 54] , [0 56] , [0 57]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 2-10,12-19,21-28,30-38; | [Y]US2012153973 (GUO DIANBO [SG]) [Y] 3,13,22,33* paragraphs [0022] , [0029]; figure 1 *; | [Y]CN104578815 (FOSHAN MEICHUAN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 2-10,12-19,21-28,30-38 * abstract *; | [Y]CN206306853U (SHENZHEN OPTIMUM BATTERY CO) [Y] 2-10,12-19,21-28,30-38 * abstract *; | [XY]US2018134169 (LOFTUS MICHAEL EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,11,20,29 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 13] , [0 16] , [0 18] , [0 23] , [0 25] , [0 30]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-10,12-19,21-28,30-38; | [Y]CN108068835 (SHIJIAZHUANG KING TRANSP EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [Y] 2-10,12-19,21-28,30-38 * abstract *; | [XY]EP3379671 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 30] , [0 37] , [0 41]; figures 3-5 * [Y] 2-10,12-19,21-28,30-38 | Examination | EP2562937 | US2015180400 |