Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467087

EP3467087 - UNIT DOSE DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel IP & Holding GmbH
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Graham, Troy R.
5035 Jeff Drive
Missoula, MT 59803 / US
02 / Lindert Nixon, Anne Elizabeth
42 Old Bethel Rd
Newtown, CT 06470 / US
03 / Harewood, Patrick Shane
1068 Shepard Avenue
Hamden, CT 06514 / US
04 / Toussa, Narcisse N
Henkelstraße 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
05 / Ordonez, Edison A.
36 Knollwood Road
Bethany, CT 06524 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Henkel IP Department
c/o Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstraße 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18206786.823.08.2011
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS201161505879P08.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161505879 P
US201037614510P23.08.2010         Original published format: US 37614510 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467087
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/04
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:EINHEITSDOSISREINIGUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/15]
English:UNIT DOSE DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF[2019/15]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE DÉTERGENT EN DOSE UNITAIRE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION[2019/15]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
09.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11820548.3  / EP2609183
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2005103222  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]; BARTHEL WOLFGANG [DE]; HARTH HUBERT [DE]; DUEFFELS A) [X] 1-3,7-16 * page 15, paragraph 4 - page 16, paragraph 2; claims 1-15 * * page 3, paragraph 6 * * page 18, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 24, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * [I] 4-6;
 [XI]US2007167340  (BARTHEL WOLFGANG [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-3,7-16 * paragraph [0239] - paragraph [0242]; claims 1-20 * * paragraph [0276] * * paragraph [0283] * [I] 4-6;
 [A]US6521584  (SOLDANSKI HEINZ-DIETER [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * claims 1-20 *
by applicantUS7439215
 US5972870
 WO0208380
 US3218776
 US4776455
 US6727215
 US6878679
 US7259134
 US7282472
 US7304025
 US7329441
 US7464519
 US7595290
 US6683039
 US5587500
 US5384422
 US5382677
 US5329030
 US4816188
 US4671900
 US6034257
 US5945394
 US6046149
 US3976586
 US3929678
 US4663071
 US5958864
 US5616781
 US3453779
 US5699653
 US5722217
 US6037319
    - SCHWARTZ; PERRY; BERCH, Surface Active Agents, Interscience Publishers, vol. I, II