Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3508818 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3508818



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 102
31.01.2020 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
08.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.01.2020 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
17.10.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.10.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
15.07.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
13.06.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
31.05.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.05.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 6
31.05.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
31.05.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.05.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 44
16.11.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.11.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
16.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
16.11.2018 Description Search / examination 18
16.11.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.11.2018 Drawings Search / examination 4
16.11.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5