Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3508818


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.01.2020 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
21.10.2019 Change - representative
07.06.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.07.2019  [2019/28]
07.06.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.07.2019  [2019/28]
16.11.2018 Change - representative