Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474041

EP3474041 - REACTIVE HYBRID LOCATION DETERMINATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bluedot Innovation Pty Ltd.
11 Agnes Street
East Melbourne, Victoria 3002 / AU
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ELDIC, Filip
707/2 McGoun Street
Richmond, Victoria 3121 / AU
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Small, Gary James
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18207352.822.04.2014
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateAU2013090136918.04.2013         Original published format: AU 2013901369
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474041
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01S19/39, G01S19/48, G01S5/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES STANDORTS VON REAKTIVEN HYBRIDEN[2019/17]
English:REACTIVE HYBRID LOCATION DETERMINATION METHOD AND APPARATUS[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINATION D'EMPLACEMENT HYBRIDE RÉACTIF[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14786084.5  / EP2987352
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011050503  (FONG THOMAS [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,9-11,13-15 * figures 7-9 * * paragraphs [0056] - [0070] - [0 75] - [0077] * [I] 4,7,8,12;
 [XI]US2009312032  (BORNSTEIN GILAD [IL] ET AL) [X] 1-3,9-11,13-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0020] - [0035] * [I] 4,5,7,8,12;
 [Y]CN102938927  (MICROSOFT CORP) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,3,7 *;
 [P]US2013093627  (COSMAN STEPHEN JAMES [US]) [P] * figures 1,3,7 * * paragraphs [0012] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0061] *;
 [Y]US2009075677  (SEGER PATRIK [SE] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * figures 2,3,5,7 * * paragraphs [0025] - [0034] - [0 39] - [0041] *;
 [Y]US8036679  (BARBEAU SEAN J [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * figures 5-6 * * column 3, lines 24-48 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 40 * * column 12, line 4 - column 14, line 23 *