Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470533

EP3470533 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO DETECT COPY NUMBER VARIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2019New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guardant Health, Inc.
505 Penobscot Drive
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / TALASAZ, AmirAli
2181 Camino A Los Cerros
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
02 / ELTOUKHY, Helmy
2 Barry Lane
Atherton, CA 94027 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Marshall, Cameron John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18207391.604.09.2013
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201261696734P04.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261696734 P
US201361793997P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361793997 P
US201261704400P21.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261704400 P
US201361845987P13.07.2013         Original published format: US 201361845987 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470533
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/6827, G16B20/10
[2019/21]
Former International [2019/16]C12Q1/68, C12N15/11
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON KOPIENZAHLVARIATIONEN[2019/16]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO DETECT COPY NUMBER VARIATION[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTECTER LA VARIATION DU NOMBRE DE COPIES[2019/16]
Examination procedure15.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
15.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13834427.0  / EP2893040
Divisional application(s)EP19192885.2
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012191367  (STUELPNAGEL JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - J. A. SHAW ET AL, "Genomic analysis of circulating cell-free DNA infers breast cancer dormancy", GENOME RESEARCH, US, (20111011), vol. 22, no. 2, doi:10.1101/gr.123497.111, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 220 - 231, XP055223848 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 229, column l, paragraph l - page 230, column l, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.123497.111
 [A]  - B. DAINES ET AL, "High-Throughput Multiplex Sequencing to Discover Copy Number Variants in Drosophila", GENETICS, (20090615), vol. 182, no. 4, doi:10.1534/genetics.109.103218, ISSN 0016-6731, pages 935 - 941, XP055160491 [A] 1-15 * page 936, column l, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.109.103218
 [A]  - LI HENG ET AL, "MAPPING SHORT DNA SEQUENCING READS AND CALLING VARIANTS USING MAPPING QUALITY SCORES", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, US, vol. 18, doi:10.1101/GR.078212.108, ISSN 1088-9051, (20080101), pages 1851 - 1858, (20080819), XP001503357 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/GR.078212.108
by applicantUS2001053519
 US2003152490
 US2011160078
 US6582908
 US7537897