Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474114

EP3474114 - COMPUTER AND METHOD FOR VISUAL NAVIGATION IN A THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE DATA SET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2020New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hicat GmbH
Brunnenallee 6
53177 Bonn / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HANßEN, Nils
Von-Kügelgen-Straße 12
53125 Bonn / DE
02 / HEY, Joachim
Oelbergstr. 98
53639 Königswinter / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date18207483.118.08.2011
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE2010104777908.10.2010         Original published format: DE102010047779
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474114
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16, G06F3/048, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0481, G06T19/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:COMPUTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VISUELLEN NAVIGATION IN EINEM DREIDIMENSIONALEN BILDDATENSATZ[2019/17]
English:COMPUTER AND METHOD FOR VISUAL NAVIGATION IN A THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE DATA SET[2019/17]
French:ORDINATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE NAVIGATION VISUELLE DANS UN ENSEMBLE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL[2019/17]
Examination procedure21.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
21.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11749791.7  / EP2625582
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[IAY]US2010174421  (TSAI MING-CHANG [US], et al) [I] 1,2,8,11,12 * paragraph [0091]; figure 18 * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0092]; figure 19 * [A] 3-6 [Y] 7,9,10;
 [Y]US2010045666  (KORNMANN DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0115]; figures 13, 14a-c * * paragraph [0134]; figures 17, 18a-b * * paragraph [0138] *;
 [Y]US2006268008  (IDESAWA MASANORI [JP], et al) [Y] 7,10 * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0086] *;
 [A]US2010188397  (TSAI RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 5 * paragraph [0054]; figure 7 *;
 [A]WO2010076772  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - ALVARO CASSINELLI ET AL, "Volume slicing display", ACM SIGGRAPH ASIA 2009 ART GALLERY & EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES: ADAPTATION ON, SIGGRAPH ASIA '09, New York, New York, USA, (20090101), doi:10.1145/1665137.1665207, ISBN 978-1-60-558878-0, page 88, XP055010269 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1665137.1665207
by applicantUS2010174421
 US2010045666
 US2010188397
 US2006268008
 WO2010076772
    - "The Volume Slicing Display", CASSINELLI, A.; ISHIKAWA, M., ACM SIGGRAPH ASIA 2009 Art Gallery & Emerging Technologies: Adaptation, ACM, pages 88 - 88