Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471149

EP3471149 - LATTICE MATCHABLE ALLOY FOR SOLAR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Change - inventorpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solar Junction Corporation
2507 W Geneva Drive
Tempe, AZ 85282 / US
[2019/23]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
Solar Junction Corporation
401 Charcot Avenue
San Jose, California 95131 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Rebecca Elizabeth
c/o Solar Junction Corporation
2507 W Geneva Drive
Tempe, AZ 85282 / US
02 / YUEN, Homan Bernard
c/o Solar Junction Corporation
2507 W Geneva Drive
Tempe, AZ 85282 / US
03 / LIU, Ting
c/o Solar Junction Corporation
2507 W Geneva Drive
Tempe, AZ 85282 / US
04 / MISRA, Pranob
c/o Solar Junction Corporation
2507 W Geneva Drive
Tempe, AZ 85282 / US
 [2019/24]
Former [2019/16]01 / JONES, Rebecca Elizabeth
505 Cypress Point Drive
Unit 130
Mountain View, CA California 94043 / US
02 / YUEN, Homan Bernard
550 Moreland Way
Apt. no. 3409
Santa Clara, CA California 95054 / US
03 / LIU, Ting
3358 Cortese Circle
San Jose, CA California 95127 / US
04 / MISRA, Pranob
755 East Capitol Avenue Apt.
L304
Milpitas, CA California 95035 / US
Representative(s)Branderhorst, Matthijs Pieter Arie
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18208211.521.12.2010
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20107490761029.03.2010         Original published format: US 74907610
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471149
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/00, H01L31/18, H01L31/078, H01L31/0735, H01L31/036, H01L31/0304, C22C30/00, C22C28/00, H01L31/0725, C30B23/02, C30B23/06, C30B29/40, C30B33/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:GITTERABSTIMMBARE LEGIERUNG FÜR SOLARZELLEN[2019/16]
English:LATTICE MATCHABLE ALLOY FOR SOLAR CELLS[2019/16]
French:ALLIAGE À TREILLIS ADAPTABLE POUR CELLULES SOLAIRES[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
26.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10849171.3  / EP2553731
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XA]  - KUDRAWIEC R ET AL, "Band gap discontinuity in Ga0.9In0.1N0.027As0.973-xSbx/GaAs single quantum wells with 0<=x", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, A I P PUBLISHING LLC, US, (20060601), vol. 88, no. 22, doi:10.1063/1.2208949, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 221113 - 221113, XP012081900 [X] 1-3 * page 1, column 1, line 27 - line 30 * [A] 4-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2208949
 [XI]  - JACKREL DAVID ET AL, "Dilute nitride GaInNAs and GaInNAsSb solar cells by molecular beam epitaxy", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20070614), vol. 101, no. 11, doi:10.1063/1.2744490, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 114916 - 114916, XP012097188 [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9-14 * pages 114916-1, column left, line last line - pages 114916-1, column right, line first * * pages 114916-2, column right, lines 1-7 * [I] 6,8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2744490
 [XI]  - PTAK A ET AL, "Effects of temperature, nitrogen ions, and antimony on wide depletion width GaInNAs", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, AVS / AIP, MELVILLE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20070531), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1116/1.2715993, ISSN 1071-1023, pages 955 - 959, XP012102988 [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,11-14 * page 955, column left * * page 957, table II * [I] 6,8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.2715993
 [A]  - YUEN HOMAN ET AL, "The role of antimony on properties of widely varying GaInNAsSb compositions", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20060511), vol. 99, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 93504 - 093504, XP012084982 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - TAKAMOTO T ET AL, "InGaP/GaAs-based multijunction solar cells", PROGRESS IN PHOTOVOLTAICS: RESEARCH AND APPLICATIONS, JOHN WILEY & SONS, LTD, (20050901), vol. 13, no. 6, doi:10.1002/PIP.642, ISSN 1062-7995, pages 495 - 511, XP002540614 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pip.642
 [A]  - GUTER WOLFGANG ET AL, "Current-matched triple-junction solar cell reaching 41.1% conversion efficiency under concentrated sunlight", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, A I P PUBLISHING LLC, US, (20090601), vol. 94, no. 22, doi:10.1063/1.3148341, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 223504 - 223504, XP012121532 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3148341
by applicant   - S. R. KURTZ; D. MYERS; J. M. OLSON, "Projected Performance of Three and Four-Junction Devices Using GaAs and GalnP", 26th IEEE Photovoltaics Specialists Conference, (19970000), doi:doi:10.1109/PVSC.1997.654226, pages 875 - 878, XP010267911

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC.1997.654226
    - A. J. PTAK et al., Journal of Applied Physics, (20050000), vol. 98, page 094501
    - PTAK et al., "Effects of temperature, nitrogen ion, and antimony on wide depletion width GalnNAs", Journal of Vacuum Science Technology B, (20070500), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 955 - 959
    - D. B. JACKREL et al., Journal of Applied Physics, (20070000), vol. 101, no. 114916
    - H. COTAL et al., Energy and Environmental Science, (20090000), vol. 2, no. 174
 US20080217818