Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471175

EP3471175 - NEGATIVE ELECTRODE PLATE AND SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
15.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited
No. 2, Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian
352100 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Jiazheng
No.2 Xin'gang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
02 / KANG, Meng
No.2 Xin'gang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
03 / PENG, Tianquan
No.2 Xin'gang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
04 / SHEN, Yuliang
No.2 Xin'gang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
05 / HE, Libing
No.2 Xin'gang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date18208317.026.11.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateCN20181046906116.05.2018         Original published format: CN201810469061
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3471175
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3471175
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/133, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M4/02, H01M4/04, // H01M10/0525
[2019/19]
Former International [2019/16]H01M4/133, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M4/02, // H01M10/0525
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/45]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEGATIVELEKTRODENPLATTE UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT[2019/16]
English:NEGATIVE ELECTRODE PLATE AND SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING THE SAME[2019/16]
French:PLAQUE D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE LA COMPRENANT[2019/16]
Examination procedure25.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/45]
25.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[X]US2014057166  (YOKOYAMA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 34] - [0035] - [0 49] - [0053] - [0 66]; examples 1-8; tables 1,3 *;
 [X]US2011171532  (OKANISHI KENGO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 7] - [0011] - [0 87] , [0 91]; table 1 *