Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3490022

EP3490022 - ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change - designated statespublished on 08.01.2020 [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Display Co., Ltd.
128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu
SEOUL, 07336 / KR
[2019/22]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Jung-Hyoung
245, LG-ro, Wollong-myeon, Paju-si
10845 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / PARK, Joon-Won
245, LG-ro, Wollong-myeon, Paju-si
10845 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2019/22]
Representative(s)Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/22]
Application number, filing date18208472.327.11.2018
[2019/22]
Priority number, dateKR2017016041728.11.2017         Original published format: KR 20170160417
[2019/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3490022
Date:29.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/52
[2019/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/02]
Former [2019/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG[2019/22]
English:ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE[2019/22]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE[2019/22]
Examination procedure27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/22]
29.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US2017084859  (SCHWAMB PHILIPP [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,13,14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0016] , [0019] , [0063] , [0072] , [0074] , [0085] , [0111]; figures 2,3,16-18 * * paragraphs [0138] , [0150] * [A] 4,6-9 [Y] 10-12;
 [X]US2002011783  (HOSOKAWA CHISHIO [JP]) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0248] , [0252] - [0257]; figure 7 *;
 [Y]EP2985803  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 10-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0026] - [0032] - [0195] , [0196] *;
 [XP]EP3331039  (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1,10,12,14 * paragraphs [0070] - [0076]; figure 3 *