Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471205

EP3471205 - ANTENNA DEVICE AND ANTENNA DEVICE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Change - designated statespublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / FUKUDA, Junichi
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18208475.613.03.2014
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2013005207114.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013052071
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471205
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01Q3/08, H04B17/12, H04B17/21, H01Q1/18
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/40]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:ANTENNA DEVICE AND ANTENNA DEVICE CONTROL METHOD[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
22.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14764220.1  / EP2975692
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO02055971  (FSONA COMM CORP [CA]; MECHERLE G STEPHEN [US]; DECANINI JORGE H [US];) [X] 1-4,6-14 * figures 1-4,6,8,9 * * claims 1-44 * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 26 * * page 5, line 4 - page 13, line 11 * [I] 5,15;
 [XI]US2011234464  (HALL RICHARD R [US]) [X] 1-4,6-14 * figures 1-3,6 * * claims 1-20 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * [I] 5,15;
 [A]US2009195467  (VASSILAKIS BILL [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007001920  (WEBB SPENCER [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-20 * * figures 6-10 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0016] , [0058] - [0061] - [0063] , [0067] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0077] *
by applicantJPH06102334