Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470005

EP3470005 - ENERGY-DELIVERY DEVICES WITH FLEXIBLE FLUID-COOLED SHAFT, INFLOW/OUTFLOW JUNCTIONS SUITABLE FOR USE WITH SAME, AND SYSTEMS INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
10.05.2019Change - classificationpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
10.05.2019Change - classificationpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BRANNAN, Joseph D
3045 Blue Sky Circle No. 18-201
Erie, CO 80516 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maschio, Antonio
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18208493.923.12.2011
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20119851551105.01.2011         Original published format: US 98515511
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3470005
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3470005
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/18, A61B18/00, // A61B17/00
[2019/24]
Former International [2019/16]A61B18/18, A61B18/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:System zur Abgabe von Energie an ein Gewebe[2019/16]
English:ENERGY-DELIVERY DEVICES WITH FLEXIBLE FLUID-COOLED SHAFT, INFLOW/OUTFLOW JUNCTIONS SUITABLE FOR USE WITH SAME, AND SYSTEMS INCLUDING SAME[2019/16]
French:Système de distribution d'énergie à un tissu[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11010176.3  / EP2474341
EP13004834.1  / EP2689739
EP14200555.2  / EP2898849
EP16204149.5  / EP3170470
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6230060  (MAWHINNEY DANIEL D [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 46 * [I] 2-4,6-10