Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471443 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471443



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 282
28.11.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.11.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
06.11.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
06.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.07.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.07.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.07.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.07.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 56
25.07.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 56
01.07.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.05.2019 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.03.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 1
15.03.2019 European search report Search / examination 1
15.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
27.11.2018 Description Search / examination 26
27.11.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
27.11.2018 Drawings Search / examination 29
27.11.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
11.03.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
11.03.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 36