Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3471443


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 (Expected) grant published on  25.12.2019 [2019/52]
15.11.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.11.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.11.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.11.2019 Change - divisional application(s) published on  04.12.2019  [2019/49]
28.08.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.07.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.07.2019 Change - inventor
05.07.2019 Change - classification published on  07.08.2019  [2019/32]
05.07.2019 Change - classification published on  07.08.2019  [2019/32]
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
05.04.2019 Change - priority published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
30.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2018 Change - representative