Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471443

EP3471443 - RADIO COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUMOTO, Atsushi
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / IMAMURA, Daichi
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-Chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / IWAI, Takashi
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
04 / OGAWA, Yoshihiko
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
05 / TAKATA, Tomofumi
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
06 / HIRAMATSU, Katsuhiko
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[2019/52]
Former [2019/16]01 / MATSUMOTO, Atsushi
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / IMAMURA, Daichi
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-Chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / IWAI, Takashi
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
04 / OGAWA, Yoshihiko
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
05 / TAKATA, Tomofumi
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
06 / HIRAMATSU, Katsuhiko
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18208571.213.08.2008
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2007021154814.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007211548
JP2008002553505.02.2008         Original published format: JP 2008025535
[2019/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471443
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3471443
Date:25.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/00, H04B1/713, H04J1/00, H04L5/00, // H04J11/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2019/16]
English:RADIO COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
25.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2019Fee for grant paid
06.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08827335.4  / EP2180732
EP12194254.4  / EP2568724
EP14183035.6  / EP2822303
EP16155383.9  / EP3038388
EP16198560.1  / EP3151590
EP17177930.9  / EP3253082
Divisional application(s)EP19206534.0
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[AD]  - SAMSUNG, "Uplink channel sounding RS structure", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-072229, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070502), vol. RAN WG1, no. Kobe, Japan; 20070502, XP050105962 [AD] 1-15 * Table 1 *