Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470487

EP3470487 - MIXED ABRASIVE POLISHING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cabot Microelectronics Corporation
870 North Commons Drive
Aurora, Illinois 60504 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / REISS, Brian
Cabot Microelectronics Corporation
c/o Legal Department
870 North Commons Drive
Aurora, IL Illinois 60504 / US
02 / NALASKOWSKI, Jakub
Cabot Microelectronics Corporation
c/o Legal Department
870 North Commons Drive
Aurora, IL Illinois 60504 / US
03 / LAM, Viet
Cabot Microelectronics Corporation
c/o Legal Department
870 North Commons Drive
Aurora, IL Illinois 60504 / US
04 / JIA, Renhe
Cabot Microelectronics Corporation
c/o Legal Department
870 North Commons Drive
Aurora, IL Illinois 60504 / US
05 / DYSARD, Jeffrey
Cabot Microelectronics Corporation
c/o Legal Department
870 North Commons Drive
Aurora, IL Illinois 60504 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18208724.730.09.2014
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20131405112110.10.2013         Original published format: US201314051121
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470487
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:C09K3/14, C09G1/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/44]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ABRASIVE GEMISCHTE POLIERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2019/16]
English:MIXED ABRASIVE POLISHING COMPOSITIONS[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE POLISSAGE ABRASIVES MIXTES[2019/16]
Examination procedure23.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/44]
23.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14852315.2  / EP3055376
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2818526  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * abstract *;
 [XP]EP2722873  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [XP] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0016] * * abstract *;
 [X]WO2013118015  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 31 * * abstract *;
 [X]US2010151684  (CHOI EUN-MI [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * abstract *;
 [X]WO2010030499  (FERRO CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * abstract *;
 [X]CN101463227  (ANJI MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [X]US2008274618  (KRAFT BRADLEY [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016] * * abstract *
by applicantUS5196353
 US5433651
 US5609511
 US5643046
 US5658183
 US5730642
 US5838447
 US5872633
 US5893796
 US5949927
 US5964643