Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470848

EP3470848 - BIOMARKERS FOR RISK ASSESSMENT AND TREATMENT MONITORING IN HEART FAILURE PATIENTS GUIDED BY NATRIURETIC PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
19.04.2019Change - classificationpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Straße 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Block, Dirk
Kreutweg 10
83673 Bichl / DE
02 / Brunner, Hans-Peter
Im Kaspar 22
4142 Münchenstein / CH
03 / Wienhues-Thelen, Ursula-Henrike
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
04 / Zaugg, Christian
Franke-Weg 6
4310 Rheinfelden / CH
05 / Dieterle, Thomas
Matthias-Grünwald-Strasse 15B
79100 Freiburg / DE
06 / Mitchell, Cheryl
Stadthausstrasse 5
6003 Luzern / CH
07 / Ubby, Johan
Luzernerstrasse 24
6330 Cham / CH
08 / Sanders-van Wijk, Sandra
Demertstraat 61
6227 Maastricht / NL
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date18208825.228.01.2014
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3470848
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3470848
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BIOMARKER ZUR RISIKOBEWERTUNG UND BEHANDLUNGSÜBERWACHUNG BEI PATIENTEN MIT HERZINSUFFIZIENZ DURCH NATRIURETISCHE PEPTIDE[2019/16]
English:BIOMARKERS FOR RISK ASSESSMENT AND TREATMENT MONITORING IN HEART FAILURE PATIENTS GUIDED BY NATRIURETIC PEPTIDES[2019/16]
French:BIOMARQUEURS POUR L'ÉVALUATION DE RISQUES ET LA SURVEILLANCE THÉRAPEUTIQUE CHEZ DES PATIENTS ATTEINTS D'INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE GUIDÉE PAR DES PEPTIDES NATRIURÉTIQUES[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14152777.0  / EP2899544
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2012106152  (ABBOTT LAB [US]; KY BONNIE [US]; CAPPOLA THOMAS PETER [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,13 *;
 [A]WO2009141374  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]; ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]; HESS GEORG [DE];) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 6, lines 21-36 * * page 18, line 37 - page 20, line 6 * * page 25, line 20 - page 27, line 8 * * examples 2, 3 *
 [Y]  - JAMES L. JANUZZI, "Use of Biomarkers to "Guide" Care in Chronic Heart Failure: What Have We Learned (So Far)?", JOURNAL OF CARDIAL FAILURE., US, (20110801), vol. 17, no. 8, doi:10.1016/j.cardfail.2011.06.373, ISSN 1071-9164, pages 622 - 625, XP055415480 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cardfail.2011.06.373
 [Y]  - MONICA R SHAH ET AL, "The STARBRITE Trial: A Randomized, Pilot Study of B-Type Natriuretic PeptideGuided Therapy in Patients With Advanced Heart Failure", JOURNAL OF CARDIAL FAILURE, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, NAPERVILLE, IL, US, vol. 17, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.CARDFAIL.2011.04.012, ISSN 1071-9164, (20110420), pages 613 - 621, (20110428), XP028261334 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cardfail.2011.04.012
 [Y]  - FELKER G M ET AL, "Biomarker-guided therapy in chronic heart failure: A meta-analysis of randomized controlled trials", AMERICAN HEART JOURNAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 158, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.AHJ.2009.06.018, ISSN 0002-8703, (20090901), pages 422 - 430, (20090709), XP026494180 [Y] 1-15 * introdcution and table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ahj.2009.06.018
 [Y]  - BONNIE KY ET AL, "The Vascular Marker Soluble Fms-Like Tyrosine Kinase 1 Is Associated With Disease Severity and Adverse Outcomes in Chronic Heart Failure", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, US, (20110701), vol. 58, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2011.03.032, ISSN 0735-1097, pages 386 - 394, XP055537972 [Y] 1-15 * see section entitled "combined use of sFlt-1 and BNP in predicting outcomes" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2011.03.032
 [Y]  - Ryo Kameda ET AL, "Soluble Fms-like Tyrosine Kinase 1 Is a Novel Predictor of Brain Natriuretic Peptide Elevation", International Heart Journal, doi:10.1536/ihj.54.133, (20130101), pages 133 - 139, URL: https://www.jstage.jst.go.jp/article/ihj/54/3/54_133/_pdf/-char/en, XP055537979 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1536/ihj.54.133
 [A]  - W. HOCHHOLZER ET AL, "Impact of soluble fms-like tyrosine kinase-1 and placental growth factor serum levels for risk stratification and early diagnosis in patients with suspected acute myocardial infarction", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, GB, (20101207), vol. 32, no. 3, doi:10.1093/eurheartj/ehq429, ISSN 0195-668X, pages 326 - 335, XP055537976 [A] 1-15 * discussion;; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/eurheartj/ehq429
by applicantWO2008015254
 WO2010070411
 WO9906445
 WO0070051
 WO2005113585
 US6709855
 US2006003338
 WO2010124821
 US6414219
 US5695761
 WO2011012268
 US4016043
 US4424279
 US4018653
 US5744305
 WO02089657
 WO02083913
 EP0648228
    - O'DONOGHUE M.; RAUNWALD E., Nat. Rev. Cardiol., (20100000), vol. 7, pages 13 - 20
    - JANUZZI J, Journal of Cardiac Failure, (20110000), vol. 17, pages 622 - 625
    - BOHM et al., Clin Res Cardiol, (20110000), vol. 100, pages 973 - 981
    - MIYATA et al., J. of Cardiology, (20120000), vol. 59, pages 352 - 358
    - J. Am. Coll. Cardiol., (20010000), vol. 38, pages 2101 - 2113
    - J. Am. Coll. Cardiol., (20050000), vol. 46, pages e1 - e82
    - SANDERS-VAN WIJK et al., Eur J Heart Fail, (20130000), vol. 15, no. 8, pages 910 - 918
    - Archives of Cardiovascular disease, (20120000), vol. 105, pages 40 - 50
    - European Heart Journal, (20080000), vol. 29, pages 2388 - 2442
    - HROMAS, Biochim Biophys Acta, (19970000), vol. 1354, pages 40 - 44
    - LAWTON, Gene, (19970000), vol. 203, pages 17 - 26
    - YOKOYAMA-KOBAYASHI, J Biochem (Tokyo, (19970000), vol. 122, pages 622 - 626
    - PARALKAR, J Biol Chem, (19980000), vol. 273, pages 13760 - 13767
    - BAUSKIN, Embo J, (20000000), vol. 19, pages 2212 - 2220
    - BOTTNER; 1999, Gene, vol. 237, pages 105 - 111
    - BAEK, Mol Pharmacol, (20010000), vol. 59, pages 901 - 908
    - MORRISH, Placenta, (19960000), vol. 17, pages 431 - 441
    - JONES, J.I. et al., Endocr. Rev., (19950000), vol. 16, pages 3 - 34
    - HWA, V. et al., Endocr. Rev, (19990000), vol. 20, pages 761 - 787
    - ONO, Y. et al., Biochem Biophys Res Comm, (19940000), vol. 202, pages 1490 - 1496
    - OH, Y. et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19960000), vol. 271, pages 30322 - 30325
    - BURGER, A.M. et al., Oncogene, (19980000), vol. 16, pages 2459 - 2467
    - SPRENGER, C.C. et al., Cancer Res, (19990000), vol. 59, pages 2370 - 2375
    - AKAOGI, K. et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 8384 - 8389
    - STCROIX, B. et al., Science, (20000000), vol. 289, pages 1197 - 1202
    - OH, Y. et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19960000), vol. 271, pages 20322 - 20325
    - KIM, H.S. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci USA, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 12981 - 12986
    - LOPEZ-BERMEJO, A. et al., J. Clinical Endocrinology and Metabolism, (20030000), vol. 88, pages 3401 - 3408
    - LOPEZ-BERMEJO, A. et al., Diabetes, (20060000), vol. 55, pages 2333 - 2339
    - O'REILLY, M.S. et al., Cell, (19970000), vol. 88, pages 277 - 285
    - ORTEGA, N.; WERB, Z., Journal of Cell Science, (20020000), vol. 115, pages 4201 - 4214
    - DENHARDT, D.T.; GUO, X., FASEB J., (19930000), vol. 7, pages 1475 - 1482
    - OLDBERG, A. et al., PNAS, (19860000), vol. 83, pages 8819 - 8823
    - OLDBERG, A. et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19880000), vol. 263, pages 19433 - 19436
    - GIACHELLI, CM. et al., Trends Cardiovasc. Med., (19950000), vol. 5, pages 88 - 95
    - KIEFER M. C et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19890000), vol. 17, page 3306
    - R.B. et al., Clin. Exp. Metastasis, (20040000), vol. 21, pages 515 - 523
    - ABDOLLAHI, A. et al., Mol. Cell, (20040000), vol. 13, pages 649 - 663
    - AMEYE, L.; YOUNG, M.F., Glycobiology, (20020000), vol. 12, pages 107R - 116R
    - TASHEVA, E.S. et al., Mol. Vis., (20020000), vol. 8, pages 407 - 415
    - TASHEVA et al., Mol. Vis., (20020000), vol. 8, pages 407 - 415
    - "uniprot", Database accession no. P17931
    - "GenBank", Database accession no. NP_002297.2
    - "GenBank", Database accession no. NM_002306.3
    - DIEPLINGER et al., Clinical Biochemistry, (20100000), vol. 43, pages 1169 - 1170
    - "GenBank", Database accession no. NP _003847.2
    - WOO et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19850000), vol. 260, no. 24, pages 13384 - 13388
    - YEH, Circulation, (20040000), vol. 109, pages II-11 - II-14
    - PEARSON et al., "Markers of Inflammation and Cardiovascular Disease", Circulation, (20030000), vol. 107, pages 499 - 511
    - POPPER H et al., Biochem Z, (19370000), vol. 291, page 354
    - SEELIG HP; WUST H., Arztl Labor, (19690000), vol. 15, page 34
    - BARTELS H et al., Clin Chim Acta, (19720000), vol. 37, page 193
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 69-93-2
    - PRAETORIUS E; POULSEN H., "Enzymatic Determination of Uric Acid with Detailed Directions", Scandinav J Clin Lab Investigation, (19530000), vol. 3, pages 273 - 280
    - TOWN MH; GEHM S; HAMMER B; ZIEGENHORN J., J Clin Chem Clin Biochem, (19850000), vol. 23, page 591
    - RICHTER, M.M., Chem. Rev., (20040000), vol. 104, pages 3003 - 3036
    - NO-LAN, Trends Biotechnol., (20020000), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 9 - 12
    - SMITH, J Endo-crinol., (20000000), vol. 167, pages 239 - 46
    - MUELLER, Clin Chem Lab Med, (20040000), vol. 42, pages 942 - 4
    - WU, Clin Chem, (20040000), vol. 50, pages 867 - 73
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, Add. APL. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. (USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444
    - KARL, Scand J Clin Lab Invest, (19990000), vol. 230, pages 177 - 181
    - YEO, Clinica Chimica Acta, (20030000), vol. 338, pages 107 - 115
    - MUELLER T. et al., Clinica Chimica Acta, (20040000), vol. 341, pages 41 - 48
    - PFISTERER M. et al., JAMA, (20090000), vol. 301, pages 383 - 92
    - FOSTER-SWANSON et al., "Reference Interval Studies of the Rate-Blanked Creatinine/Jaffe Method on BM/Hitachi Systems in Six U. S. Laboratories", Clin Chem, (19940000), no. 361
    - SCHMIDT, "Die enzymatische Bestimmung von Glucose and Fructose nebeneinander", Klinische Wochenzeitschrift, (19610000), vol. 39, pages 1244 - 1247