Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3525235 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3525235



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 189
20.08.2019 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
25.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
25.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.07.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
25.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
17.07.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.03.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 7
25.03.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
25.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
21.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.03.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.03.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
04.03.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
04.03.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
04.03.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
04.02.2019 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
30.01.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
28.11.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
28.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
28.11.2018 Description Search / examination 23
28.11.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
28.11.2018 Drawings Search / examination 12
28.11.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5